Decrees from the Provincial Minister appointing Guardians and Vicars in the Church Street Friary. Fr. Angelus O’Neill OFM Cap. as Guardian on 5 Sept. 1970 Fr. Silvester O’Flynn OFM Cap. as Guardian on 20 Aug. 1976 Fr. Anthony Boran OFM Cap. as Vicar on 20 Aug. 1976
The decree of the Sacri Consilii Christiano Nomini Propagando entrusting All Hallows College to the Irish Province of the Congregation of the Mission. Includes two non-identical typewritten copies.
A view of the dedication of the small church on top of Croagh Patrick in County Mayo which took place on 20 July 1905. The plate has a printed caption.
Draft deed appointing new Vincentian Trustees regarding ‘funds placed at the disposal […] for the education of the poor of Ireland’ and regarding land held in Grange Gorman.
Deed of Richard Samuel Owen Robinson and Rev. Andrew Craig Robinson appointing Thomas Jones Robinson to be a trustee of the will Sarah Blair in the place of Richard Bell Robinson, deceased. With a declaration that the lands and premises which are the subject of the trusts of the will of Sarah Blair should forthwith be vested in Thomas Jones Robinson.
Deed appointing new trustees to premises on Father Mathew Quay and Father Mathew Street held by an assignment of a lease dated 20 Mar. 1951 (see CA HT/2/1/2/34). The FMC trust, a limited company having a registered office at the Capuchin Friary, Church Street, Dublin, is appointed a trustee in place of Fr. Michael John O’Shea OFM Cap. and Fr. Mel Peter Farrell OFM Cap., both deceased. With a cover letter.
Deed of Assignment regarding Sweetman’s Avenue, Blackrock. It is a true copy of a deed of 17 December 1818 from Michael McEvoy to Patrick Hanly. It refers back to land transactions involving the Reverend John Burrowes of Prospect, Blackrock, and William Hennessy in 1789. Includes a photocopy of the deed and also a page of notes from 1932 about the property.
Deed of assignment from Fr. Goodwyn Peter Augustine Lawless OSFC to Fr. Daniel Patrick O’Reilly OSFC of his interest in a plot ground on the west side of Church Street whereupon a Roman Catholic Church (St. Mary of the Angels) now stands. Reference is made to the conveyance of the said plot of ground made to Fr. Lawless and others on 9 July 1875. In consideration of 10s.
Deed of assignment from Fr. Richard Dominick Clarke OSFC to Fr. Paul Neary OSFC, Fr. Nicholas Murphy OSFC, Fr. Columbus Maher OSFC and Fr. Bernard Jennings OSFC of his interest in premises on Bow Street (formerly nos. 22 and 23 and the premises at no. 25 on the said street) for the residue of the terms specified in the original leases. In consideration of 10s.
Deed of attorney by Mary Ellen Smith of Toulouse, Kingdom or France. She appoints Elizabeth Smith as her attorney and agent regarding a deed of release involving the Reverends Peter Duff and Malachy O'Callaghan. Mention is also made of the will of Ellen Cronyn.